This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:49:35 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. ESPINO, ALONDRA CASADOS

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ESPINO, ALONDRA CASADOS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5519

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 12

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiffs

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT #06

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

ESPINO, ALONDRA CASADOS

Houston, TX 77015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

BARLOW, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

08/01/2022: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

08/04/2022: INTERVENING PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

09/13/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BARLOW, JUSTIN; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT #06;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ESPINO, ALONDRA CASADOS; Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 9/9/2022; Tracking: 74032290; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 12;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT #2 is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant