This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:48:57 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. CRUZ, ANTONIO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CRUZ, ANTONIO PEREZ. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5514

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 20

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiffs

MOUNT HOUSTON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT

LDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

CRUZ, ANTONIO PEREZ

Houston, TX 77038

CRUZ, HILDA

Houston, TX 77088

NATIONSBANC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

MIJARES, HILDA

Other, Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

NATIONSBANC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

EAST, ROBERT GREGORY

WALTERS, PAMELA H

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

08/11/2022: INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

EXHIBIT A

08/11/2022: EXHIBIT A

Citation

08/05/2022: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

08/04/2022: INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Letter From Hilda Mijares dated August 2, 2022 Stating that She is Not Responsible for the Property

08/04/2022: Letter From Hilda Mijares dated August 2, 2022 Stating that She is Not Responsible for the Property

Citation

08/04/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: WALTERS, PAMELA H; Person Filing: LDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EAST, ROBERT GREGORY; Person Filing: MOUNT HOUSTON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MIJARES, HILDA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NATIONSBANC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/12/2022; Tracking: 74032244; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CRUZ, HILDA; Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/2/2022; Returned: 8/4/2022; Tracking: 74032242; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CRUZ, ANTONIO PEREZ; Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/2/2022; Returned: 8/3/2022; Tracking: 74032241; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 20;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONSBANC MORTGAGE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where MOUNT HOUSTON ROAD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant