Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/27/2020 at 20:19:10 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY ET AL vs. COLLINS, ROBERT L (AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS)

Case Summary

On 06/08/2015 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against COLLINS, ROBERT L AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2647

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY ET AL

Intervenor Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

COLLINS, ROBERT LUTHER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY)

BESHEANS, JERRY (AKA JERRY MICHAEL BOSHEARS)

BOSHEARS, JERRY MICHAEL

BESHEANS, JERRY (A/K/A JERRY MICHAEL BOSHEARS)

COLLINS, ROBERT L (AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS)

Island, TX 78597

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Intervenor Defendant

COLLINS, ROBERT L (AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS)

Island, TX 78597

Other

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING KENNETH MAGIDSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

WALTERS, PAMELA H

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CROSS, NANCY A. BURNS

COLLINS, ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Citation

06/08/2015: Citation

Citation

06/08/2015: Citation

Original Petition for Taxes and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

06/08/2015: Original Petition for Taxes and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

Citation

06/26/2015: Citation

Disclaimer of Interset by The United States of America

07/27/2015: Disclaimer of Interset by The United States of America

Intervenor's Original Petition

07/27/2015: Intervenor's Original Petition

Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

08/10/2015: Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

Citation

08/19/2015: Citation

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

09/18/2015: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

09/18/2015: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Plaintiffs Original Answer to Defendants Counter Claim

12/02/2015: Plaintiffs Original Answer to Defendants Counter Claim

Certificate of Written Discovery

12/28/2015: Certificate of Written Discovery

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

01/05/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

01/20/2016: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Notice of Partial Dismissal

01/20/2016: Notice of Partial Dismissal

Notice of Trial Hearing

04/27/2016: Notice of Trial Hearing

AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

07/27/2016: AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

Request for Order of Sale in Tax Suit

08/29/2016: Request for Order of Sale in Tax Suit

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: COLLINS, ROBERT L (AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS); Issued: 9/8/2016; Served: 12/6/2016; Tracking: 73282776; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 7/27/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: AWAITING TAX MASTER RECOMMENDATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Trial Commenced; Comments: 07172016; Requesting Party: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketDescription: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 8/10/2015;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketDescription: DISCLAIMER; Filing Attorney: CROSS, NANCY A. BURNS; Person Filing: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 6/11/2015; Tracking: 73139379; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 6/11/2015; Served: 6/25/2015; Tracking: 73139378; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COLLINS, ROBERT L (AKA ROBERT LUTHER COLLINS); Issued: 6/11/2015; Tracking: 73139377; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY ET AL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant