This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:47:09 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. CARRILLO, FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CARRILLO, FRANCISCO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5492

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants

CARRILLO, FRANCISCO

Houston, TX 77067

CARRILLO, ARACELI (AKA ARACELY CARRILLO)

Houston, TX 77067

CARRILLO, ARACELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

08/26/2022: Citation

Citation

08/26/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARRILLO, ARACELI (AKA ARACELY CARRILLO); Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 8/24/2022; Tracking: 74032289; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARRILLO, FRANCISCO; Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 8/24/2022; Tracking: 74032286; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Flood Control District is a litigant