This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/27/2023 at 09:39:34 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. ARMAND PLAZA LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ARMAND PLAZA LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4743

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiffs

CITY OF HOUSTON

CLEAR CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants and Others

ARMAND PLAZA LLC

ENTERPRISE BANK & TRUST (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY)

COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL HOUSTON INC (AKA COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL INC)

COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL INC (IN REM ONLY)

ARMAND PLAZA LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

ENTERPRISE BANK & TRUST (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALFRED, MARGARET

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON L.

 

Court Documents

DCA Generic Letter

08/07/2023: DCA Generic Letter

SOS Return Citation

08/02/2023: SOS Return Citation

DCA Generic Letter

07/24/2023: DCA Generic Letter

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

07/18/2023: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

Motion To Dismiss As To Intervenor Only

07/13/2023: Motion To Dismiss As To Intervenor Only

Proposed Master in Chancery's Report To The District Court

07/13/2023: Proposed Master in Chancery's Report To The District Court

Proposed Order Of Dismissal As To Intervenor Only

07/13/2023: Proposed Order Of Dismissal As To Intervenor Only

MOTION FOR NON SUIT

06/27/2023: MOTION FOR NON SUIT

Proposed Master in Chancerys Report To The District Court

06/27/2023: Proposed Master in Chancerys Report To The District Court

Proposed Order Of Dismissal

06/27/2023: Proposed Order Of Dismissal

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

06/27/2023: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Secretary of State

05/30/2023: Secretary of State

RETURN CITATION Enterprise Bank & Trust

05/04/2023: RETURN CITATION Enterprise Bank & Trust

CITATION

03/29/2023: CITATION

Intervening Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition

03/08/2023: Intervening Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition

Return of Service

12/14/2022: Return of Service

Citation

12/14/2022: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORGINIAL PETITION

11/22/2022: INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORGINIAL PETITION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2023

HearingCourt: 556; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A); Results: Set In Error; Comments: DUPLICATE ENTRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

HearingCourt: 556; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 7/18/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDescription: DISMISSAL RECOMMENDED;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 6/27/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ENTERPRISE BANK & TRUST (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY; Issued: 4/6/2023; Tracking: 74145594; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: CLEAR CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: CLEAR CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL HOUSTON INC (AKA COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL INC); Issued: 11/14/2022; Served: 12/12/2022; Returned: 12/13/2022; Tracking: 74077542; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ENTERPRISE BANK & TRUST (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY; Issued: 11/14/2022; Tracking: 74077541; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ARMAND PLAZA LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 11/14/2022; Tracking: 74077540; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less