This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 12:45:31 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. 223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against 223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5914

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants

223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC

MOODY NATIONAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY)

READY CABLE INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

Others

223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

10601 Clarence Dr Suite 250

Frisco, TX 75033

MOODY NATIONAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY

2302 Post Office St

Galveston, TX 77550

READY CABLE INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS

4416 Keller Hicks Rd Fort

Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Defendant Attorney

DOW, SANFORD L

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

08/01/2022: Original Petition

Citation

08/01/2022: Citation

Citation

08/01/2022: Citation

Citation

08/01/2022: Citation

Defendant's Original Answer

08/30/2022: Defendant's Original Answer

Return of Service

08/24/2022: Return of Service

Citation

08/23/2022: Citation

Citation

08/19/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DOW, SANFORD L; Person Filing: 223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: READY CABLE INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 8/1/2022; Tracking: 74032964; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MOODY NATIONAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY; Issued: 8/1/2022; Served: 8/23/2022; Tracking: 74032963; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 223 ORIOLE STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 8/1/2022; Served: 8/17/2022; Tracking: 74032960; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moody National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Ready Cable, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant