This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 07:22:56 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 1-A vs. FRETTY, VERNON ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 1-A filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against FRETTY, VERNON ANTHONY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4364

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 1-A

Defendants

FRETTY, VERNON ANTHONY

Crosby, TX 77532

GOUDEAU, SHELLY D

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX, TED A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

07/22/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

07/22/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

07/22/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/22/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

08/02/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

08/05/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GOUDEAU, SHELLY D; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/28/2021; Returned: 7/29/2021; Received: 8/2/2021; Tracking: 73893529; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FRETTY, VERNON ANTHONY; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/30/2021; Returned: 7/30/2021; Tracking: 73893528; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COX, TED A.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 1-A;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX, TED A.