This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/03/2022 at 07:35:37 (UTC).

HARRINGTON, JOSEPH COURTNEY vs. HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 HARRINGTON, JOSEPH COURTNEY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY CSCD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4263

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRINGTON, JOSEPH COURTNEY

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HUMBLE ISD POLICE DEPARTMENT

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINSTRATION

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS DIVISION/EXPUNCTIONS

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE-CJAD

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/1/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: HARRINGTON, JOSEPH COURTNEY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant