This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2018 at 21:53:38 (UTC).

HARLAN, PAUL vs. COLLINS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 HARLAN, PAUL filed an Other lawsuit against COLLINS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WESLEY R. WARD. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2069

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WESLEY R. WARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARLAN, PAUL

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

COLLINS, ROBERT

Houston, TX 77270

FRIED, JOSEPH

GUMPRECHT, MICHAEL

Others

FRIED, JOSEPH BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

GUMPRECHT, MICHAEL BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

3Rd Party Defendants

CAMERON N E LANDRY

CAMERON N E LANDRY LAW L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEARS, ROSS A.

SEARS, ROSS A. II

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON, BLAIRE BRUNS

FOLEY, ZANDRA ELAYNE

KIMMITT, GERARD JOSEPH II

JOHNSON, ANDREW LEE

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

02/25/2016: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

DCA Generic Letter

04/20/2016: DCA Generic Letter

Notice of Change of Address

07/26/2016: Notice of Change of Address

Exhibit 01

10/07/2016: Exhibit 01

Exhibit 02

10/24/2016: Exhibit 02

Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

11/29/2016: Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

12/05/2016: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Proposed Order

12/16/2016: Proposed Order

Exhibit 01

01/24/2017: Exhibit 01

Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address

02/14/2017: Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address

Proposed Order

03/16/2017: Proposed Order

Exhibit A-01

03/16/2017: Exhibit A-01

ORDER SIGNED DENYING SPECIAL APPEARANCE

03/23/2017: ORDER SIGNED DENYING SPECIAL APPEARANCE

Fourteenth court of appeals (Postcard)

05/02/2017: Fourteenth court of appeals (Postcard)

Request for Supplemental Clerk's Record

07/12/2017: Request for Supplemental Clerk's Record

Rule 11 Agreement

08/08/2017: Rule 11 Agreement

Letter regarding pending case balance

09/07/2017: Letter regarding pending case balance

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

09/07/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KIMMITT, GERARD JOSEPH II; Person Filing: GUMPRECHT, MICHAEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Description: THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEARS, ROSS A. II; Person Filing: HARLAN, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Description: THIRD PARTY PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, BLAIRE BRUNS; Person Filing: COLLINS, ROBERT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT; Order Signed: 9/5/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Description: THIRD PARTY PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, ANDREW LEE; Person Filing: FRIED, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Description: ORD SIGNED GRANTING FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; Order Signed: 4/25/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEARS, ROSS A. II; Person Filing: HARLAN, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Order Signed: 3/23/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, BLAIRE BRUNS; Person Filing: COLLINS, ROBERT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, ZANDRA ELAYNE; Person Filing: FRIED, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL; Order Signed: 12/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEARS, ROSS A. II; Person Filing: HARLAN, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Description: PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND; Order Signed: 11/7/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/31/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/11/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNSON, BLAIRE BRUNS; Person Filing: COLLINS, ROBERT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEARS, ROSS A. II; Person Filing: HARLAN, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less