Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 07:19:02 (UTC).

HANNON, JAMES ET AL vs. AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS THE HEWIETT

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 HANNON, JAMES filed an Other lawsuit against AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS THE HEWIETT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4691

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNON, JAMES ET AL

Defendants

SQUARE D COMPANY

BAE SYSTEMS INC AND BAE SYSTEMS SENSOR SYSTEMS GROUP

HOOKERS CHEMICAL CO (SUED AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO (SUES INDIVIDUALLY DOING BUSINESS AS AND

COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN

AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS THE HEWIETT

VIACORACBS INC (FKA VIACOM INC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO

AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC ET AL

SPECIALTY MINERALS INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AS A SUBSIDIARY OF MINERALS

NOXELL CORP (A SUBSIDIARY OF COTY INC AND FKA NOXZEMA

DAP PRODUCTS INC

UNION CARBIDE CORP

LOREAL USA INC (DBA LANCOME)

COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCESSOR IN INTREST

DUREZ CORP

COTY INC (AND ITS SUBSIDIARY NOXELL CORP FOR ITS COVERGIRL

LOCKHEED MARIN TACTICAL SYSTEMS

VANDERBILT MINERALS LLC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO

THE HEWLETT PACKARD CO

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

1201 Elm Street

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendant Attorney

WANAT, THERESA MARIE

1100 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

1000 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

600 Travis Str

Houston, TX 77002

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

595 Orleans, S

Beaumont, TX 77701

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

P O Box 16

Beaumont, TX 77704

DODSON, ROBERT EDWIN

4646 Summerhill

Texarkana, TX 75504

 

Court Documents

Filing Letter

02/01/2021: Filing Letter

Defendant General Electronic Company's Motion to Transfer Venue Special Exceptions and Subject thereto Original Answer, and Answer to all Cross Actions

02/01/2021: Defendant General Electronic Company's Motion to Transfer Venue Special Exceptions and Subject thereto Original Answer, and Answer to all Cross Actions

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

02/04/2021: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Plaintiffs' Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice As To Rockwell Collins INC.

02/04/2021: Plaintiffs' Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice As To Rockwell Collins INC.

Jury Demand

02/05/2021: Jury Demand

Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation Original Answer

02/05/2021: Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation Original Answer

Defendant Emerson Electric Co.'s Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Its Anwer To Plaintiff's Original Petition Cross-Claim and Answer To All Cross-Claims

02/05/2021: Defendant Emerson Electric Co.'s Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Its Anwer To Plaintiff's Original Petition Cross-Claim and Answer To All Cross-Claims

Notification Of Service of Medical Report Complying with 90.003 or 90.10 (f)(1)

02/08/2021: Notification Of Service of Medical Report Complying with 90.003 or 90.10 (f)(1)

Defendant York International Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

02/08/2021: Defendant York International Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Defendant Pfizer INC'S Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer Special Exceptions, Affirmative, Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Requests For Disclosure To Plaintiffs

02/08/2021: Defendant Pfizer INC'S Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer Special Exceptions, Affirmative, Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Requests For Disclosure To Plaintiffs

Certificate Of Written Discovery

02/10/2021: Certificate Of Written Discovery

Defendant General Electric Company's Designation Of Fact and Expert Witnesses

02/10/2021: Defendant General Electric Company's Designation Of Fact and Expert Witnesses

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

02/11/2021: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

02/12/2021: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

02/12/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

02/18/2021: Suggestion of Bankruptcy

EXHIBIT A

01/26/2021: EXHIBIT A

NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13 OF TAG-ALONG CASE

01/26/2021: NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13 OF TAG-ALONG CASE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 2/12/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 2/12/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 2/11/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WANAT, THERESA MARIE; Person Filing: BAE SYSTEMS INC AND BAE SYSTEMS SENSOR SYSTEMS GROUP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DODSON, ROBERT EDWIN; Person Filing: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO (SUES INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEDYARD, DAVID W.; Person Filing: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP (FKA HOOKERS CHEMICAL CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 2/4/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCESSOR BY MERGER TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOSTELLER, MISTI DAWN; Person Filing: HANNON, JAMES ET AL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATHEN, FRANK J. II; Person Filing: HANNON, DANNIE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN is a litigant

Latest cases where DAP PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DUREZ CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where NOXELL CORPORATION is a litigant