This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/14/2018 at 17:24:19 (UTC).

HANNIGAN, JOHN vs. EDISON, JAYNE

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 HANNIGAN, JOHN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EDISON, JAYNE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6955

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Defendants, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

INNOVATE LLC

HANNIGAN, JOHN

HANNIGAN, MELISSA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

OFFICE FURNITURE INNOVATIONS LLC

THE LITTLE KAHUNA LLC

EDISON, JAYNE

INNOVATE LLC

HANNIGAN, MELISSA

Others

HANNIGAN-BRANNOCK, BELINDA BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

COY, JOSH BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE

3Rd Party Defendants

COY, JOSH

Columbus, OH 43220

HANNIGAN-BRANNOCK, BELINDA

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BROWN, JAY W.

600 Travis Str

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAMBERS, ADAM BRETT

1811 Bering Dri

Houston, TX 77057

BROWN, JAY W.

600 Travis Str

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs' Original Petition Verified Application for Temporary Restraining Order Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction

02/03/2016: Plaintiffs' Original Petition Verified Application for Temporary Restraining Order Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction

Exhibit A-2

02/04/2016: Exhibit A-2

Prposed Docket Control Order

09/06/2016: Prposed Docket Control Order

Exhibit A-12

11/24/2016: Exhibit A-12

Exhibit A

11/24/2016: Exhibit A

Affidvait of Hilary Borow

12/20/2016: Affidvait of Hilary Borow

Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Funds From the Registry of the Court

12/20/2016: Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Funds From the Registry of the Court

Exhibit B-12

02/07/2017: Exhibit B-12

Exhibit A-3

02/07/2017: Exhibit A-3

Proposed Order

05/08/2017: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant Jayne Edison and Response to Defendants Motion to Quash Notice of Intent to Take Deposition of Jayne Edison

05/24/2017: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant Jayne Edison and Response to Defendants Motion to Quash Notice of Intent to Take Deposition of Jayne Edison

Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Quash Notice of Intent to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Jayne Edison

06/05/2017: Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Quash Notice of Intent to Take the Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Jayne Edison

Exhibit E-02

11/21/2017: Exhibit E-02

Notice of oral Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Compete Tax Returns

12/05/2017: Notice of oral Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Compete Tax Returns

Affidavit of Hilary C. Borow

12/15/2017: Affidavit of Hilary C. Borow

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

12/18/2017: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

03/13/2018: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED

SETTING REMINDER

03/14/2018: SETTING REMINDER

346 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 7/12/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Description: ORDER DISBURSING REGISTRY FUNDS SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/13/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER; Order Signed: 2/16/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING ORAL HEARING; Order Signed: 1/30/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 12/18/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/16/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Description: PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND; Order Signed: 11/9/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHAMBERS, ADAM BRETT; Person Filing: OFFICE FURNITURE INNOVATIONS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHAMBERS, ADAM BRETT; Person Filing: THE LITTLE KAHUNA LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 2/5/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Description: BOND WAIVED/NO BOND SET; Order Signed: 2/5/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/5/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, JAY W.; Person Filing: HANNIGAN, JOHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, JAY W.; Person Filing: INNOVATE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, JAY W.; Person Filing: HANNIGAN, MELISSA;

    Read MoreRead Less