Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/30/2020 at 13:59:30 (UTC).

HAMMERLY NAILS 2 LP (D/B/A ELEGANT NAILS & SPA) vs. BROWN, DENNIS (DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE)

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 HAMMERLY NAILS 2 LP D/B/A ELEGANT NAILS SPA filed an Other lawsuit against BROWN, DENNIS DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2835

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HAMMERLY NAILS 2 LP D/B/A ELEGANT NAILS & SPA

HAMMERLY NAILS 2 LP (D/B/A ELEGANT NAILS & SPA)

ELEGANT NAILS & SPA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BROWN, DENNIS

BROWN, DENNIS (DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE)

Houston, TX 77057

TOTAL STRUCTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEADE, ANDREW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PORTZ, CHARLES H. III

 

Court Documents

Harris County Civil Process Request - Total Structure

10/07/2020: Harris County Civil Process Request - Total Structure

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

10/16/2020: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

10/02/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PORTZ, CHARLES H. III; Person Filing: TOTAL STRUCTURE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PORTZ, CHARLES H. III; Person Filing: BROWN, DENNIS (DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: PORTZ, CHARLES H. III; Person Filing: BROWN, DENNIS (DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BROWN, DENNIS (DBA TOTAL STRUCTURE); Issued: 10/8/2020; Tracking: 73798540; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MEADE, ANDREW; Person Filing: ELEGANT NAILS & SPA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MEADE, ANDREW; Person Filing: HAMMERLY NAILS 2 LP (D/B/A ELEGANT NAILS & SPA);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTZ III, CHARLES H