This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:33:21 (UTC).

HAAS, DIEM HOANG-NGOC vs. HAAS, STEVEN WAYNE

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 HAAS, DIEM HOANG-NGOC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HAAS, STEVEN WAYNE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6373

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HAAS, DIEM HOANG-NGOC

HAAS, STEVEN WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LOUDIN, SUZANNE

FREDRICKSON, ERIC LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2006
  • QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - FREDRICKSON, ERIC LEE Person Filing - HAAS, STEVEN WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FREDRICKSON, ERIC LEE Person Filing - HAAS, STEVEN WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOUDIN, SUZANNE Person Filing - HAAS, DIEM HOANG-NGOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOUDIN, SUZANNE Person Filing - HAAS, DIEM HOANG-NGOC

    Read MoreRead Less