This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/26/2021 at 07:25:14 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ, LINDA vs. COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 GUTIERREZ, LINDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6931

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ, LINDA

Defendants

COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC

Others

COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH ITS

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND

11111 Wilcrest Green Drive Suite #100

Houston, TX 77042

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOVAR, CHRISTIAN

Defendant Attorney

ZITO, NICHOLAS E.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS LANDMARD INDUSTRIES LLC LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC AND TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER

08/19/2021: DEFENDANTS LANDMARD INDUSTRIES LLC LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC AND TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLCS ORIGINAL ANSWER

DEFENDANTS LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC AND TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLCS JURY DEMAND

08/19/2021: DEFENDANTS LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC AND TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLCS JURY DEMAND

Return of Service

08/19/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

08/18/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

08/18/2021: Return of Service

Return of Service

08/16/2021: Return of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition

08/02/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request For Issuance Of Service

08/02/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service

Request For Issuance of Service

08/02/2021: Request For Issuance of Service

Ltr to Clerk re Citation Fee Payment

08/02/2021: Ltr to Clerk re Citation Fee Payment

Civ Proc Req - Landmark Industries Energy, LLC

08/02/2021: Civ Proc Req - Landmark Industries Energy, LLC

Civil Proc Req - Texas Petroleum Group, LLC

08/02/2021: Civil Proc Req - Texas Petroleum Group, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/17/2021; Received: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73897233; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/17/2021; Received: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73897233; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/17/2021; Received: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73897233; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND; Issued: 8/2/2021; Tracking: 73897225; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND; Issued: 8/2/2021; Tracking: 73897225; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND THROUGH ITS; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/16/2021; Received: 8/19/2021; Tracking: 73897221; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/12/2021; Received: 8/16/2021; Tracking: 73897217; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COCA-COLA SOUTHWEST BEVERAGES LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY AND; Issued: 8/2/2021; Served: 8/12/2021; Received: 8/16/2021; Tracking: 73897217; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TOVAR, CHRISTIAN; Person Filing: GUTIERREZ, LINDA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases where Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant