This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:12:36 (UTC).

GUERRA, JOSE vs. A O SMITH CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 GUERRA, JOSE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A O SMITH CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0545

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GUERRA, JOSE

AMERAFLEX RUBBER & GASKET COMPANY INC

ANCO INSULATION INC

ASARCO INCORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

D&F DISTRIBUTING INC

GREENE TWEED & CO

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

A O SMITH CORP

A O SMITH CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS)

RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR.

CLARY, BRIAN S.

RAMSEY, RUSSELL J.

LACKEY, DOUG

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BLAKENEY, MICHAEL LADON

KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

CARLSON, ERIC

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

POWELL, LISA A.

BLAZEK, PAULA H

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

POWERS, JAMES H.

CALDERON, RAUL M.

WHITE, CLAY M.

Other Attorneys

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

CLARK, SANDRA FRENCH

25 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALLEY, JEFFREY S. Person Filing - LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION (D/K/A MARTIN MARIETTA CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT Person Filing - GREENE TWEED & CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT Person Filing - GREENE TWEED & CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - AMETEK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALLEY, JEFFREY S. Person Filing - MARTIN MARIETTA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR. Person Filing - GUERRA, JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less