This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:21:10 (UTC).

GREENTREE- SAND CREEK TRAIL ASSOCIATION INC vs. VILLARREAL, NEREYDA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 GREENTREE- SAND CREEK TRAIL ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against VILLARREAL, NEREYDA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0001

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENTREE- SAND CREEK TRAIL ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

VILLARREAL, NEREYDA

Kingwood, TX 77345

CAMARGO, JOSE

Kingwood, TX 77345

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

07/17/2020: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

07/21/2020: Affidavit of Service

Civil process Request

07/07/2020: Civil process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/07/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAMARGO, JOSE; Issued: 7/7/2020; Served: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73764414; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VILLARREAL, NEREYDA; Issued: 7/7/2020; Served: 7/15/2020; Tracking: 73764411; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: GREENTREE- SAND CREEK TRAIL ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less