This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/09/2021 at 07:31:20 (UTC).

GREEN, JOSEPH vs. MUHAMMAD, IRFAN

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 GREEN, JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MUHAMMAD, IRFAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3210

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN, JOSEPH

Defendants

MUHAMMAD, IRFAN

Houston, TX 77081

SRIDHAR, RAKSHITHA

Houston, TX 77063

RAZA ZAIDI, HUSNAIN

Houston, TX 77498

LYFT INC (D/B/A LYFT DRIVERS TEXAS INC)

LYFT DRIVERS TEXAS INC

ZAIDI, ZYED HUSNAIN RAZA

Other

LYFT INC (D/B/A LYFT DRIVERS TEXAS INC) (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request For Issuance Of Service - Zaidi

07/16/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service - Zaidi

Request For Issuance Of Service - Muhammad

07/16/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service - Muhammad

Request For Issuance Of Service - Sridhar

07/16/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service - Sridhar

Request For Issuance Of Service

07/16/2021: Request For Issuance Of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/16/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

CITATION: MUHAMMAD, IRFAN:

07/21/2021: CITATION: MUHAMMAD, IRFAN:

Citation LYFT INC:

07/21/2021: Citation LYFT INC:

CITATION: RAZA ZAIDI HUSNAIN:

07/22/2021: CITATION: RAZA ZAIDI HUSNAIN:

Answer

07/22/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: ZAIDI, ZYED HUSNAIN RAZA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RAZA ZAIDI, HUSNAIN; Issued: 7/19/2021; Served: 7/21/2021; Tracking: 73892133; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SRIDHAR, RAKSHITHA; Issued: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73892131; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MUHAMMAD, IRFAN; Issued: 7/19/2021; Served: 7/20/2021; Tracking: 73892130; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LYFT INC (D/B/A LYFT DRIVERS TEXAS INC) (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 7/19/2021; Served: 7/20/2021; Tracking: 73892128; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: GREEN, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LYFT DRIVES TEXAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burkhalter, James D