This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:24:02 (UTC).

GREEN, GREGORY vs. TETER, THOMAS BRITE JR

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 GREEN, GREGORY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TETER, THOMAS BRITE JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8638

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN, GREGORY

Defendant

TETER, THOMAS BRITE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

SHIVERS JR., CRAIG M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHIVERS JR., CRAIG M. Person Filing - TETER, THOMAS BRITE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KIESCHNICK, JONATHAN CHRISTOPHER Person Filing - GREEN, GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less