This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/13/2015 at 01:35:09 (UTC).

GREEN, EARLEY vs. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2005 GREEN, EARLEY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7253

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GREEN, EARLEY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO INC

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (FKA GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION) (IND AND AS

GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION

GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC (CORPORATION) (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC (AKA AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON

ERIE CITY IRON WORKS

AMETEK INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO HAVEG INDUSTRIES INC)

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION (FKA HERCULES INC)

HERCULES INC

RILEY POWER INC (FKA BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC FKA D B RILEY INC FKA

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR.

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

RHODES, KENNETH D.

WADE, TODD N.

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

WHITE, CLAY M.

TAYLOR, THOMAS W

POWERS, JAMES H.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

Other Attorneys

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

ZOELLER, PAUL JOSEPH

RICE, B. STEVE

HARDING, LISA D.

NEWSOM, JAMES A.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

ALFRED, GARY E.

WARE, JAMES L.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEWSOM, JAMES A. Person Filing - SEPCO CORPORATION (TEXAS CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALFRED, GARY E. Person Filing - ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FRASE, LAURA ANN Person Filing - INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (IND AND AS A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SCOFIELD, DENISE URZENDOWSKI Person Filing - SHELL OIL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - SCOFIELD, DENISE URZENDOWSKI Person Filing - SHELL OIL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR. Person Filing - GREEN, EARLEY

    Read MoreRead Less