This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 02:14:29 (UTC).

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC vs. SALOF LTD INC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALOF LTD INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2752

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC

Defendants

SALOF LTD INC

LUHRS, ROBERT

Braunfels, TX 78132

Other

SALOF LTD INC (DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1248 Fm 1101 New

Braunfels, TX 78130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADERHOLT, BEN LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Citation Corporate SALOF LTD INC

03/11/2022: Citation Corporate SALOF LTD INC

Plaintiffs Original Petition

03/02/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Exhibit A

03/02/2022: Exhibit A

Rule 11 Agreement

04/22/2022: Rule 11 Agreement

Citation - LUHRS, ROBERT

04/05/2022: Citation - LUHRS, ROBERT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUHRS, ROBERT; Issued: 3/2/2022; Served: 3/30/2022; Tracking: 73978543; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SALOF LTD INC (DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/2/2022; Served: 3/7/2022; Received: 3/11/2022; Tracking: 73978537; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ADERHOLT, BEN LOUIS; Person Filing: GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben L. Aderholt