Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:38:39 (UTC).

GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP vs. AQUAPHARM PCHEM LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 GRAY REED MCGRAW LLP filed an Other lawsuit against AQUAPHARM PCHEM LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE and DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9470

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP

Defendants

STANLEY, MARK E

AQUAPHARM PCHEM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, KENNETH C.

1601 Elm St., S

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

GLOVER, JOHN H.

 

Court Documents

DOCKET.CONTROL.ORDER

04/23/2020: DOCKET.CONTROL.ORDER

Proposed Agreed Final Order:

06/11/2020: Proposed Agreed Final Order:

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

04/03/2020: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

Defendant Aquapharm PCHEM LLC's Original Answer

04/15/2020: Defendant Aquapharm PCHEM LLC's Original Answer

Plaintiff's Petition for Interpleader

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Petition for Interpleader

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 295; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLOVER, JOHN H.; Person Filing: AQUAPHARM PCHEM LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/3/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gray Reed & McGraw LLP is a litigant