This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:06:54 (UTC).

GRATEHOUSE, KIMBERLEIGH E vs. GRATEHOUSE, GLEN RAY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 GRATEHOUSE, KIMBERLEIGH E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRATEHOUSE, GLEN RAY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8042

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRATEHOUSE, KIMBERLEIGH E

Defendant

GRATEHOUSE, GLEN RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHALLCROSS, LAWRENCE B. JR.

Defendant Attorney

FOSTER, W. DOUGLAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOSTER, W. DOUGLAS Person Filing - GRATEHOUSE, GLEN RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHALLCROSS, LAWRENCE B. JR. Person Filing - GRATEHOUSE, KIMBERLEIGH E

    Read MoreRead Less