This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 06:26:38 (UTC).

GRAHAM, CRAIG vs. TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 GRAHAM, CRAIG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1067

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM, CRAIG

Defendants

TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC

TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH

TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH ASGARD US

BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC

SCHLUMBERGER LLC

SCHLUMBERGER LTD

M-I L L C

SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED

Others

SCHLUMBERGER LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED

5900 Balcones Drive Suite 100

Austin, TX 78731

SCHLUMBERGER LTD (A FOREIGN COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY

206 E 9Th St Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

M-I L L C (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, KURT BRYNILDE

Defendant Attorneys

CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY

MOUTON, CHARLES A.

NYE, JAMES HUNTER

SCOFIELD, DENISE URZENDOWSKI

Other Attorneys

DELOS E. FLINT, JR (PRO HAC VICE FOR TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

04/04/2022: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

Notice of Submission (LTRO 4.25.2022):

04/13/2022: Notice of Submission (LTRO 4.25.2022):

Proposed Order

04/13/2022: Proposed Order

Ex 2

04/13/2022: Ex 2

Ex 1

04/13/2022: Ex 1

Certificate of Conference

04/13/2022: Certificate of Conference

PETITION FOR LETTERS ROGATORY

04/13/2022: PETITION FOR LETTERS ROGATORY

NOTICE TO COURT OF FILING OF MOTION TO TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13, RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

04/19/2022: NOTICE TO COURT OF FILING OF MOTION TO TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13, RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

PROPOSED ORDER

04/20/2022: PROPOSED ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' PETITION FOR LETTERS ROGATORY

04/20/2022: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' PETITION FOR LETTERS ROGATORY

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

04/22/2022: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

04/22/2022: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

04/22/2022: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

04/22/2022: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

Ex. A Order Granting Stay 1E0

04/25/2022: Ex. A Order Granting Stay 1E0

NOTICE OF STAY

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF STAY

NOTICE OF INTENTION

04/29/2022: NOTICE OF INTENTION

DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

05/03/2022: DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT CERTIFICATE

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingCourt: 080; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: LETTER ROGATORY (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: STAY FILED 4.25 SEE #101594582; Requesting Party: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/6/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MOUTON, CHARLES A.; Person Filing: BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: TRITON VOYAGER ASSET LEASING GMBH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRAWFORD, TODD GREGORY; Person Filing: TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NYE, JAMES HUNTER; Person Filing: SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NYE, JAMES HUNTER; Person Filing: M-I L L C;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: M-I L L C (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 7/9/2021; Served: 7/13/2021; Tracking: 73888788; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCHLUMBERGER LTD (A FOREIGN COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY; Issued: 7/9/2021; Served: 7/13/2021; Tracking: 73888785; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCHLUMBERGER LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 7/9/2021; Served: 7/13/2021; Tracking: 73888781; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ARNOLD, KURT BRYNILDE; Person Filing: GRAHAM, CRAIG;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M-I L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where BOE EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Schlumberger LTD is a litigant