This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/18/2021 at 07:41:06 (UTC).

GR PARTNERS BURKE LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 GR PARTNERS BURKE LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9892

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GR PARTNERS BURKE LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHEIF

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

10/25/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Return of Service- HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

11/08/2021: Return of Service- HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Citation-HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

11/08/2021: Citation-HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHEIF; Issued: 10/26/2021; Served: 11/1/2021; Tracking: 73931962; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: GR PARTNERS BURKE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GR Partners Burke LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE