This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 07:34:09 (UTC).

GPM PUMP AND SEAL LLC vs. MANSUR, MELISSA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 GPM PUMP AND SEAL LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MANSUR, MELISSA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8889

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GPM PUMP AND SEAL LLC

Defendant

MANSUR, MELISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS, ALASDAIR ANDREW

1235 North Loop

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

Verification

09/22/2020: Verification

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

09/22/2020: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit D

09/22/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

09/22/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

09/22/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

09/22/2020: Exhibit A

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

09/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

09/24/2020: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit

09/24/2020: Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit

Motion for Nonsuit

09/24/2020: Motion for Nonsuit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Results: Passed; Requesting Party: ROBERTS, ALASDAIR ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/24/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PASSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: ROBERTS, ALASDAIR ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER RESET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: ROBERTS, ALASDAIR ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER RESET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROBERTS, ALASDAIR ANDREW; Person Filing: GPM PUMP AND SEAL LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less