This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:06:19 (UTC).

GOTTSCHALK, ROGER FRANK vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 GOTTSCHALK, ROGER FRANK filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******537A

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOTTSCHALK, ROGER FRANK

GOTTSCHALK, CHRISTINA

GOTTSCHALK, CHRISTINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

ANDERSON, KIMBERLY (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT FRANK GOTTSCHALK)

GOTTSCHALK, SHARON (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT FRANK GOTTSCHALK)

Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

DANA CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (CORPORATION)

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO

95 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

FONVILLE, CHRISTOPHER JOSEPH

REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN

Defendant Attorney

WILKINSON, ROBERT W

Other Attorneys

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

CLARY, BRIAN S.

POWERS, JAMES H.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • ANSWER FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED REMOVING TRIAL READY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • ANSWER FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILKINSON, ROBERT W Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, SHARON (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT FRANK GOTTSCHALK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, ROGER FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - ANDERSON, KIMBERLY (DAUGHTER OF DECEDENT FRANK GOTTSCHALK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REAGIN, HILARY GLASSMAN Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, CHRISTINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2007
  • MOTION TO APPLY OUT OF STATE LAW GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - CARVER PUMP COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - FLUOR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILKINSON, ROBERT W Person Filing - GUARDLINE INC (CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • ANSWER CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - WATHEN, FRANK J. II Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, ROGER FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - WATHEN, FRANK J. II Person Filing - GOTTSCHALK, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less