This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/25/2022 at 07:39:37 (UTC).

GORITY, LISA vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 GORITY, LISA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8261

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORITY, LISA

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DA'S OFFICE

HCSO

HARRIS COUNTY PCT 5

TEXAS DPS

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, MEKISHA JANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingCourt: 125; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PCT 5; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089718; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089712; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089711; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089710; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089708; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089707; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 12/15/2022; Tracking: 74089706; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 12/6/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, MEKISHA JANE; Person Filing: GORITY, LISA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less