This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 07:30:39 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. JOY, RANDY R (III) (AKA TREY JOY)

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOY, RANDY R III AKA TREY JOY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9359

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

JOY, RANDY R (III) (AKA TREY JOY)

Highlands, TX 77562

JOY, TREY

JOY, DEBBIE HOLLIN (AKA DEBBIE HOLLIN AKA DEBORAH JEAN HOLLIN)

Houston, TX 77093

HOLLIN, DEBBIE

HOLLIN, DEBORAH JEAN

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT #1

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT #14

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

06/30/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

Civil Process Request

06/30/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

06/30/2022: Exhibit A

LETTER TO CLERK

06/30/2022: LETTER TO CLERK

Citation/Return of Service

07/08/2022: Citation/Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JOY, RANDY R (III) (AKA TREY JOY); Issued: 6/30/2022; Returned: 7/20/2022; Tracking: 74022543; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JOY, DEBBIE HOLLIN (AKA DEBBIE HOLLIN AKA DEBORAH JEAN HOLLIN); Issued: 6/30/2022; Served: 7/7/2022; Returned: 7/7/2022; Tracking: 74022537; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATING INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Water Control and Improvement District Number 109 is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant