This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/24/2022 at 08:22:36 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD vs. RIVERA, DONACIANO CALZADA

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RIVERA, DONACIANO CALZADA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7987

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTR

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

RIVERA, DONACIANO CALZADA

RIVERA, GRACE M.

Baytown, TX 77520

CITY OF BAYTOWN

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Filing Letter

11/30/2022: Filing Letter

Exhibit A

11/30/2022: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

11/30/2022: Civil Process Request

CITATION

11/30/2022: CITATION

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/30/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

12/13/2022: Citation

CITATION

12/22/2022: CITATION

Civil Process Request

12/22/2022: Civil Process Request

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVERA, GRACE M.; Issued: 12/22/2022; Tracking: 74092243; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVERA, GRACE M.; Issued: 12/1/2022; Returned: 12/8/2022; Tracking: 74083485; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE DISTR;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less