This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/24/2023 at 07:47:08 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ZFG-F1 LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ZFG-F1 LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6474

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Defendants

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

ZFG-F1 LLC

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Defendant and Intervenor Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ZFG-F1 LLC

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Other

ZFG-F1 LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT TEAM BIBLE INC BY SERVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

01/31/2023: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

01/31/2023: Civil Process Request

Citation

01/31/2023: Citation

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/31/2023: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

02/10/2023: Citation

Exhibit A

02/16/2023: Exhibit A

Intervenors Original Petition

02/16/2023: Intervenors Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZFG-F1 LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT TEAM BIBLE INC BY SERVING; Issued: 2/1/2023; Returned: 2/8/2023; Tracking: 74105924; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less