This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 01:44:42 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GRAVES, SHARON K

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GRAVES, SHARON K. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

GRAVES, SHARON K

Highlands, TX 77562

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/03/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

01/03/2022: Citation

Civil Process Request

01/03/2022: Civil Process Request

Correspondence

01/03/2022: Correspondence

Exhibit A

01/03/2022: Exhibit A

Citation

01/12/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GRAVES, SHARON K; Issued: 1/3/2022; Served: 1/7/2022; Returned: 1/7/2022; Tracking: 73956587; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Water Control and Improvement District Number 109 is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant