This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:23:19 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. TERRY, MARGARET (AKA MARGARET TERRY HUNTER)

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TERRY, MARGARET AKA MARGARET TERRY HUNTER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7843

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

TERRY, MARGARET (AKA MARGARET TERRY HUNTER)

Houston, TX 77026

HUNTER, MARGARET TERRY

HUNTER, MARGARET TERRY (AKA MARGARET TERRY)

TERRY, KENNETH (AKA KENNETH WAYNE TERRY)

Houston, TX 77047

TERRY, KENNETH WAYNE

TERRY, KENNETH WAYNE (AKA KENNETH TERRY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Defendant Attorney

BREAUX, JANA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

CITATION

06/24/2022: CITATION

CITATION

06/24/2022: CITATION

Civil Process Request

06/24/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

06/24/2022: Exhibit A

Defendant' Kenneth Terry's Original Answer

07/08/2022: Defendant' Kenneth Terry's Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BREAUX, JANA NICOLE; Person Filing: TERRY, KENNETH WAYNE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TERRY, KENNETH (AKA KENNETH WAYNE TERRY); Issued: 6/27/2022; Returned: 7/13/2022; Tracking: 74020846; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TERRY, MARGARET (AKA MARGARET TERRY HUNTER); Issued: 6/27/2022; Tracking: 74020845; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant