This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/24/2022 at 08:22:14 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. SMITH, ANDREW E

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SMITH, ANDREW E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7984

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

SMITH, ANDREW E.

Baytown, TX 77521

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Filing Letter

11/30/2022: Filing Letter

Exhibit A

11/30/2022: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

11/30/2022: Civil Process Request

CITATION

11/30/2022: CITATION

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/30/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

12/16/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMITH, ANDREW E.; Issued: 12/1/2022; Served: 12/12/2022; Returned: 12/13/2022; Tracking: 74083506; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD AND LEE COLLEGE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less