This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 11:21:42 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. ROBINSON, STELLA WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND SUC

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ROBINSON, STELLA WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND SUC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2000

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

THE CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants

ROBINSON, STELLA WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND SUCH PERSON'S UNKNOWN

ROBINSON, JOHN ANDREW (A/K/A JA ROBINSON)

Baytown, TX 77521

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

ROBINSON, JA (A/K/A JOHN ANDREW ROBINSON)

Intervenor Defendants

ROBINSON, STELLA

ROBINSON, JAMES ANDREW (AKA J A ROBINSON)

ROBINSON, J A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/26/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation

09/26/2022: Citation

Civil Process Request

09/26/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

09/26/2022: Exhibit A

Intervenors Original Petition

10/11/2022: Intervenors Original Petition

Exhibit A

10/11/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

10/11/2022: Exhibit B

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: THE CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROBINSON, JOHN ANDREW (A/K/A JA ROBINSON); Issued: 10/7/2022; Served: 10/12/2022; Returned: 10/13/2022; Tracking: 74061848; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant