This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 07:48:03 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. RIVAS, JOSE C

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RIVAS, JOSE C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9578

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Defendants

RIVAS, JOSE C

Baytown, TX 77520

RIVAS, ENEDINA

Baytown, TX 77520

HILL, RONNIE GLEN

Baytown, TX 77520

CITY OF BAYTOWN

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

06/30/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

06/30/2022: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

EXHIBIT A

06/30/2022: EXHIBIT A

Letter Regarding Attached Documents

06/30/2022: Letter Regarding Attached Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVAS, JOSE C; Issued: 7/1/2022; Returned: 7/22/2022; Tracking: 74022807; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HILL, RONNIE GLEN; Issued: 7/1/2022; Served: 7/15/2022; Returned: 7/15/2022; Received: 7/19/2022; Tracking: 74022796; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVAS, ENEDINA; Issued: 7/1/2022; Returned: 7/22/2022; Tracking: 74022795; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant