This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:26:22 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. PALMER, DAVID L (AKA DAVID LEE PALMER) (WHOSE LOCA

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PALMER, DAVID L AKA DAVID LEE PALMER WHOSE LOCA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7858

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT # 1-A

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

PALMER, DAVID L (AKA DAVID LEE PALMER) (WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND

PALMER, DAVID LEE

PALMER, DAVID LEE (AKA DAVID L PALMER)

PALMER, DOROTHY FAYE (AKA DOROTHY BURRIS PALMER) (WHOSE LOCATION IS

PALMER, DOROTHY BURRIS

PALMER, DOROTHY BURRIS (AKA DOROTHY FAYE PALMER)

PALMER, MELISSA KAYE

Webster, TX 77598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

COX, TED A.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

CITATION

06/24/2022: CITATION

Exhibit A

06/24/2022: Exhibit A

Request for Issuance of Service

06/24/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation/Return of Service

07/08/2022: Citation/Return of Service

ORIGINAL INTERVENTION

07/05/2022: ORIGINAL INTERVENTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: COX, TED A.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT # 1-A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PALMER, MELISSA KAYE; Issued: 6/27/2022; Returned: 7/5/2022; Tracking: 74020956; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX, TED A.