This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/24/2023 at 07:40:49 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. MARTINEZ, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MARTINEZ, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6401

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Others

MARTINEZ, FERNANDO

MARTINEZ, ROSA

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK) (IN REM ONLY)

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICE DISTRICT 14

THE BANK OF NEW YORK (IN REM ONLY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

EXhibit A

01/31/2023: EXhibit A

Civil Process Request

01/31/2023: Civil Process Request

Citation

01/31/2023: Citation

Citation

01/31/2023: Citation

Citation

01/31/2023: Citation

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/31/2023: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation

02/13/2023: Citation

Citation

02/13/2023: Citation

Citation

02/21/2023: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MARTINEZ, FERNANDO; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/8/2023; Returned: 2/8/2023; Tracking: 74105615; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (F/K/A THE BANK OF NEW YORK) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 2/1/2023; Tracking: 74105608; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MARTINEZ, ROSA; Issued: 2/1/2023; Served: 2/8/2023; Returned: 2/8/2023; Tracking: 74105601; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less