This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 07:47:29 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. GONZALEZ, TEODORO

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GONZALEZ, TEODORO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9566

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

GONZALEZ, TEODORO

Pasadena, TX 77506

GONZALEZ, MARIA

Pasadena, TX 77506

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

06/30/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

CITATION

06/30/2022: CITATION

Civil Process Request

06/30/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

06/30/2022: Exhibit A

Letter Regarding Attached Documents

06/30/2022: Letter Regarding Attached Documents

Citation/Return of Service

07/11/2022: Citation/Return of Service

Citation/Return of Service

07/11/2022: Citation/Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GONZALEZ, MARIA; Issued: 7/1/2022; Returned: 7/7/2022; Received: 7/11/2022; Tracking: 74022964; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GONZALEZ, TEODORO; Issued: 7/1/2022; Returned: 7/7/2022; Received: 7/11/2022; Tracking: 74022962; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant