This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:27:56 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. CORLEY, SCOTT S (AKA SCOTT STEVEN CORLEY) WHOSE LO

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CORLEY, SCOTT S AKA SCOTT STEVEN CORLEY WHOSE LO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7866

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendant and Intervenor Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

CORLEY, SCOTT S (AKA SCOTT STEVEN CORLEY) WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN

CORLEY, SCOTT STEVEN

CORLEY, BARBARA ANN

Mckinney, TX 75069

TINDOL, LENERD VENERD (AKA LENARD VERNON TINDOL) WHOSE LOCATION IS

TINDOL, LENARD VERNON

CALHOUN, NADINE WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND

CALHOUN, KAREN (AKA KAREN MARIE YMAN)

Shoals, TX 78654

HYMAN, KAREN MARIE

CALHOUN, STEPHANIE ANN

Baytown, TX 77520

CALHOUN, THOMAS LEE WHOSE LOCATION IS UNKNOWN AND

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

06/24/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

06/24/2022: Citation

Citation

06/24/2022: Citation

Citation

06/24/2022: Citation

Civil Process Request

06/24/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

06/24/2022: Exhibit A

INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

07/07/2022: INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

EX A

07/07/2022: EX A

EX B

07/07/2022: EX B

EX C

07/07/2022: EX C

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CALHOUN, STEPHANIE ANN; Issued: 6/24/2022; Returned: 7/14/2022; Tracking: 74020037; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CALHOUN, KAREN (AKA KAREN MARIE YMAN); Issued: 6/24/2022; Tracking: 74020036; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CORLEY, BARBARA ANN; Issued: 6/24/2022; Tracking: 74020035; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant