This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 07:58:22 (UTC).

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI vs. BRANSFORD, MICHELLE RENEE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRI filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against BRANSFORD, MICHELLE RENEE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLANEL M. MCFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants

BRANSFORD, MICHELLE RENEE

Baytown, TX 77521

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/26/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

09/26/2022: Citation

Civil Process Request

09/26/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

09/26/2022: Exhibit A

Affidavit

10/17/2022: Affidavit

Envelope

10/17/2022: Envelope

Bransford Intervenors Original Petition

10/11/2022: Bransford Intervenors Original Petition

Bransford Exhibit A

10/11/2022: Bransford Exhibit A

Citation

10/11/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRANSFORD, MICHELLE RENEE; Issued: 9/29/2022; Served: 10/5/2022; Returned: 10/7/2022; Received: 10/11/2022; Tracking: 74058253; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant