This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:22:26 (UTC).

GOMEZ, FRANCISCO vs. WUKOSON, SARAH

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 GOMEZ, FRANCISCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WUKOSON, SARAH. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0688

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, FRANCISCO

Defendant

WUKOSON, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASQUEZ, SCOTT S.

Defendant Attorney

COOPER, MICHAEL W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • MOTION TO RETAIN GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COOPER, MICHAEL W. Person Filing - WUKOSON, SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - VASQUEZ, SCOTT S. Person Filing - GOMEZ, FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less