Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 10:07:47 (UTC).

GOMEZ, BEATRIZ SALAZAR vs. KROGER TEXAS LP

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 GOMEZ, BEATRIZ SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9166

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, BEATRIZ SALAZAR

Defendant

KROGER TEXAS LP

Other

KROGER TEXAS LP MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASU, ANNIE

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

Jury Demand

03/05/2021: Jury Demand

Defendant's Original Answer

03/05/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Citation (Kroger Texas LP)

03/08/2021: Citation (Kroger Texas LP)

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

02/12/2021: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

02/12/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS LP MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 2/23/2021; Served: 2/27/2021; Tracking: 73842797; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BASU, ANNIE SHONAI; Person Filing: GOMEZ, BEATRIZ SALAZAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.