This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:23:48 (UTC).

GOLUB, MARILYN vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 GOLUB, MARILYN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3743

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLUB, MARILYN

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POISSANT, MARGARET ANNE

Defendant Attorney

STEWART, G. TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEWART, G. TODD Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEWART, G. TODD Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POISSANT, MARGARET ANNE Person Filing - GOLUB, MARILYN

    Read MoreRead Less