This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:19:55 (UTC).

GINN, STACY vs. FORA FINANCIAL ADVANCE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 GINN, STACY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against FORA FINANCIAL ADVANCE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1417

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GINN, STACY

RE TITANS LLC

Defendants

FORA FINANCIAL ADVANCE

FINANCIAL AGENT SERVICES

FORA FINANCIAL

Other

FORA FINANCIAL ADVANCE LLC

519 8Th Avenue New

York, NY 10018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TITTLEBAUM, MARC M

TITTLEBAUM, MARC MARAMAN

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1647

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking # 7018 1830 0001 4427 1647

Certified Mail Receipt

06/01/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Rule 11 Agreement

06/17/2020: Rule 11 Agreement

UNSWORN DECLARATION OF STACY GINN

05/26/2020: UNSWORN DECLARATION OF STACY GINN

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

05/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FORA FINANCIAL ADVANCE LLC; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73752931; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TITTLEBAUM, MARC MARAMAN; Person Filing: RE TITANS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TITTLEBAUM, MARC MARAMAN; Person Filing: GINN, STACY;

    Read MoreRead Less