This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 01:27:35 (UTC).

GILMAN, SUZANNE VO vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 GILMAN, SUZANNE VO filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5097

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILMAN, SUZANNE VO

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT 5

17423 Katy Freeway,

Houston, TX 77094

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT FOR PRECINCT 5, PLACE 2

16715 Clay Road,

Houston, TX 77084

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHAFFER, MACKENZIE DON

Defendant Attorney

ROSE, BRIAN LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Another Docket; Reason: COORDINATORS REMINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingCourt: 157; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: PER M.SCHAFFER VIA PHONE 3/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT FOR PRECINCT 5, PLACE 2; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73986722; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73986721; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT 5; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73986717; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73986714; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73986712; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73984613; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 3/23/2022; Tracking: 73984609; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSE, BRIAN LYNN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT FOR PRECINCT 5, PLACE 2; Issued: 2/4/2022; Tracking: 73968711; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE RETURNED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE'S OFFICE PRECINCT 5; Issued: 2/4/2022; Tracking: 73968709; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 2/4/2022; Tracking: 73965134; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 2/4/2022; Tracking: 73965133; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 2/4/2022; Tracking: 73965132; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/31/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCHAFFER, MACKENZIE DON; Person Filing: GILMAN, SUZANNE VO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY - JUSTICE OF PEACE, PRECINCT 4, PLACE 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLES OFFICE PCT. 4 is a litigant