This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:27:20 (UTC).

GIBSON, LINSEY NICOLE vs. GIBSON, ANDRE FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 GIBSON, LINSEY NICOLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GIBSON, ANDRE FERNANDO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6317

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIBSON, LINSEY NICOLE

Defendant

GIBSON, ANDRE FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRITT, JUSTIN LAREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2011
  • WAIVER CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • ORD SGND GRNTNG CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WRITT, JUSTIN LAREY Person Filing - GIBSON, LINSEY NICOLE

    Read MoreRead Less