This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:37:33 (UTC).

GIBSON APPLIED TECHNOLOGY & ENGINEERING (TEXAS) LL vs. MERIDIAN ENERGY GROUP INC.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 GIBSON APPLIED TECHNOLOGY ENGINEERING TEXAS LL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERIDIAN ENERGY GROUP INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1704

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GATE

GIBSON APPLIED TECHNOLOGY & ENGINEERING (TEXAS) LL

Defendant

MERIDIAN ENERGY GROUP INC.

Other

MERIDIAN ENERGY GROUP INC (SOUTH DAKOTA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

16770 Imperial Valley Dr Suite 220

Houston, TX 77060

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACNAUGHTON, JAMES ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Citation and Affidavit

06/04/2020: Citation and Affidavit

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MERIDIAN ENERGY GROUP INC (SOUTH DAKOTA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/2/2020; Tracking: 73752854; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MACNAUGHTON, JAMES ROBERT; Person Filing: GATE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MACNAUGHTON, JAMES ROBERT; Person Filing: GIBSON APPLIED TECHNOLOGY & ENGINEERING (TEXAS) LL;

    Read MoreRead Less