This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:36:37 (UTC).

GHANNI, BABATUNDE vs. GHANNI, HOLLY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 GHANNI, BABATUNDE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GHANNI, HOLLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6397

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHANNI, BABATUNDE

Defendant

GHANNI, HOLLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALSANDOR, CHERYL LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2004
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2004
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALSANDOR, CHERYL LYNN Person Filing - GHANNI, BABATUNDE

    Read MoreRead Less