This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/13/2021 at 07:36:01 (UTC).

GERLERO, MARTIN vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 GERLERO, MARTIN filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3266

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERLERO, MARTIN

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 4

7900 Will Clayton Parkway,

Houston, TX 77388

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, MEKISHA JANE

917 Franklin

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingCourt: 190; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 4; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73866770; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73865077; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73865076; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73865075; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73865074; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73865072; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 4/28/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WALKER, MEKISHA JANE; Person Filing: GERLERO, MARTIN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 4 is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant