Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:47:21 (UTC).

GAYE, LATONYA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIENDS OF EXXXX HXXXXXXXX {A vs. H-E-B LP

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 GAYE, LATONYA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIENDS OF EXXXX HXXXXXXXX A filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against H-E-B LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9552

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HXXXXXXXX, EXXXX (A MINOR)

GAYE, LATONYA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIENDS OF EXXXX HXXXXXXXX {A

Defendant

H-E-B LP

Guardian Ad Litem

HATCHETT, MICHAEL KYLE

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS, ROXELL ANN

6420 Richmond A

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem

05/08/2020: Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem

Proposed Order Granting appointment of guardian ad litem

04/01/2020: Proposed Order Granting appointment of guardian ad litem

Notice of Submission

04/01/2020: Notice of Submission

Defendnat's Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem

04/01/2020: Defendnat's Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (FRIENDLY SUIT)

03/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION (FRIENDLY SUIT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 5/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 5/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • HearingCourt: 165; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: AD LITEM APPOINTMENT GUARDIAN; Results: Granted; Comments: ORDER SIGNED; Requesting Party: PATTERSON, KIP EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHARDS, ROXELL ANN; Person Filing: GAYE, LATONYA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIENDS OF EXXXX HXXXXXXXX {A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHARDS, ROXELL ANN; Person Filing: HXXXXXXXX, EXXXX (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEB LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDS, ROXELL ANN